Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ortega Franco, C.O.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1941 Born
24 Nov 196826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
11 Feb 200462.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
11 Feb 200462.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
26 Mar 200462.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
16 Feb 201977.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ortega Franco
Bishop Antonio Ortega Franco C.O. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEmpalme Escobedo
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,554
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Feb 2019

Quantcast