Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Miguel Ángel Giles Vázquez

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1941BornCoatepec Harinas
29 Jun 196422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Toluca, México, México
19 Jun 200462.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
2 Sep 200462.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
7 Sep 200564.0DiedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Ángel Giles Vázquez:
Bishop José Miguel Ángel Giles Vázquez (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Altamirano

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,679
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014