Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Díaz Díaz

Bishop of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1952 Born
23 Oct 197725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
30 Apr 200350.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
30 Apr 200350.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Izirzada
10 Jul 200351.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Izirzada
15 May 201461.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
11 Mar 201764.7AppointedBishop of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México
19 May 201764.9InstalledBishop of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Enrique Díaz Díaz
Bishop Enrique Díaz Díaz (born ) Bishop of Irapuato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuandacareo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Irapuato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,421
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 May 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2017
  • i: CB, 6 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017