Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Octavio Balmori Cinta, M.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1943 Born
17 May 197026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionari di S. Giuseppe nel Messico
5 Apr 200258.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
5 Jun 200258.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
19 Mar 202076.3RetiredBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Roberto Octavio Balmori Cinta
Bishop Roberto Octavio Balmori Cinta M.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Valles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoatzacoalcos
Ordained BishopParque Guadiana, Ciudad Valles, Diocese of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ciudad Valles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,195
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast