Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ciudad Valles

Dioecesis Vallipolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 27 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: San Luís Potosí
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 14,273 (5,512 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noreste
  • Mailing Address: Calle 16 de Septiembre 726, Apartado 170, 79000 Ciudad Valles, San Luis Potosi, México
  • Telephone: (481)382-25-97; 381-25-44
  • Fax: 382-47-96

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
27 November 1960ErectedDiocese of Huejutla
Diocese of San Luis Potosí
Diocese of Ciudad Valles (erected)
28 May 1997Territory LostDiocese of Ciudad Valles
Archdiocese of San Luis Potosí
Diocese of Matehuala (erected)
25 November 2006Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ciudad Valles (from Monterrey)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1965399,000400,00099.8%2923112,87044517ap1967
1968432,000435,00099.3%3143512,34265019ap1971
1976498,500502,00099.3%30144411,329176633ap1977
1980522,000525,00099.4%34175110,235208941ap1981
1990669,000720,00092.9%42105212,8651112834ap1991
1999825,000925,00089.2%48126013,7501211837ap2000
2000841,500943,50089.2%50126213,5721211640ap2001
2001859,500964,50089.1%52126413,4291211641ap2002
2002875,500981,00089.2%48126014,5911212141ap2003
2003885,000985,00089.8%52136513,6151311441ap2004
2004890,000990,00089.9%56147012,7141710641ap2005
2006939,000999,00094.0%61157612,3551710542ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 4 Jul 2012