Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juvencio González Alvarez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1917Born
19 Dec 194225.8Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 198062.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
19 Mar 198063.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
8 Jul 199477.3RetiredBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
18 Jul 199578.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Juvencio González Alvarez
Bishop Juvencio González Alvarez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Valles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatehuala

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018