Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Reyes Ramos

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1913Born
22 May 193723.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 196653.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
24 Feb 196753.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México
26 Jul 196956.0DiedBishop of Ciudad Valles, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Reyes Ramos
Bishop Alfonso Reyes Ramos (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Valles

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018