Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gustavo Rodriguez Vega

Archbishop of Yucatán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1955 BornMonterrey
15 Aug 198025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
27 Jun 200146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
27 Jun 200146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
14 Aug 200146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
8 Oct 200853.5AppointedBishop of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México
19 Nov 200853.6InstalledBishop of Nuevo Laredo, Tamaulipas, México
1 Jun 201560.2AppointedArchbishop of Yucatán, México
29 Jul 201560.3InstalledArchbishop of Yucatán, México

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Rodriguez Vega:
Archbishop Gustavo Rodriguez Vega (born ) Archbishop of Yucatán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Yucatán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2015
  • i: CB, 2 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015