Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Sergio de Jesús Mena Díaz

Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México

Titular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1955 Born
7 Oct 198631.4Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
27 May 201762.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México
27 May 201762.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
18 Jul 201762.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum

MicroData Summary for Pedro Sergio de Jesús Mena Díaz
Bishop Pedro Sergio de Jesús Mena Díaz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColonia Yucatán, Archdiocese of Yucatán
Ordained PriestCentro de Convenciones Siglo XX, Mérida, Archdiocese of Yucatán

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Yucatán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 27 May 2017
  • ob: CB, 20 Jun 2017
  • c34: CB, 5 Jul 2017
  • c4: CB, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017