Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Gerardo Garza Treviño

Bishop of Piedras Negras, Coahuila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1947 BornMonterrey
26 Oct 197224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
8 Jan 200355.1AppointedBishop of Piedras Negras, Coahuila, México
25 Mar 200355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Piedras Negras, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for Alonso Gerardo Garza Treviño:
Bishop Alonso Gerardo Garza Treviño (born ) Bishop of Piedras Negras

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Piedras Negras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,356
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013