Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Martínez Castilla

Archbishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1950 Born
31 Jan 197726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
13 Mar 200756.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
4 May 200756.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Lázaro Cárdenas, Michoacán, México
19 Feb 201362.5AppointedArchbishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Fabio Martínez Castilla
Archbishop Fabio Martínez Castilla (born ) Archbishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIslas Mujeres

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,415
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast