Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Víctor René Rodríguez Gómez

Bishop of Valle de Chalco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1950 BornSan Martín de las Pirámides
21 Nov 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Texcoco, México, México
13 May 200655.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Texcoco, México, México
13 May 200655.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiburnia
25 Jul 200655.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiburnia
25 Oct 201261.9AppointedBishop of Valle de Chalco, México, México

MicroData Summary for Víctor René Rodríguez Gómez:
Bishop Víctor René Rodríguez Gómez (born ) Bishop of Valle de Chalco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valle de Chalco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,213
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013