Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Jafet Herrera Castillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México

Titular Bishop of Gegi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1916Born
21 Dec 194024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
29 Jan 197861.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México
29 Jan 197861.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gegi
25 Apr 197861.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gegi
1 Jun 198165.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Yucatán, México

MicroData Summary for Domingo Jafet Herrera Castillo
Bishop Domingo Jafet Herrera Castillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Yucatán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcanceh, Archdiocese of Yucatán
Ordained BishopStade municipal, Merida

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Number 3,299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Jun 2020

Quantcast