Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Mimbela y Morlans, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1661Born
26 Feb 171452.7AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 Nov 171453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Nov 171453.4InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 May 172159.8DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Mimbela y Morlans
Bishop Manuel de Mimbela y Morlans O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFraga en Aragón, Spain

  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 86
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018