Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Anesagasti y Llamas

Deceased

Bishop of Campeche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1863BornSanta María de Mundaca, Spain
3 Nov 188623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 Nov 190946.4AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
12 Dec 190946.6Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
4 Jan 191046.6InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
3 Oct 191047.4DiedBishop of Campeche, México

MicroData Summary for Jaime Anesagasti y Llamas:
Bishop Jaime Anesagasti y Llamas (born , died ) Bishop of Campeche

  • a priest for 23.9 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013