Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe de Jesús Cueto González, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tlalnepantla, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1904Born
24 Sep 193228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Jan 196459.5AppointedBishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
1 Apr 196459.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
28 May 197974.9RetiredBishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
16 Aug 198379.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tlalnepantla, México, México

MicroData Summary for Felipe de Jesús Cueto González
Bishop Felipe de Jesús Cueto González O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tlalnepantla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtzatlán

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018