Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Gómez Malaver (Maraver)

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1548AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Mar 1550Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Dec 1551DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gómez Malaver (Maraver)
Bishop Pedro Gómez Malaver (Maraver) (died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada, Archdiocese of Granada, Spain
Death Place

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,557
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,810
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 62, Number 348
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018