Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Ayala, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503Born
18 Dec 155552.9AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
8 Nov 156259.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Sep 156966.7DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Ayala
Bishop Pedro de Ayala O.F.M. (born 1503, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceGuadalajara, Diocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,816
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 72, Number 423
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast