Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Villagómez

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
1 Mar 1562Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
16 Jul 1563InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
10 Feb 1571DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

MicroData Summary
Fernando de Villagómez
Bishop Fernando de Villagómez
(died )
Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastroverde, Diocese of Lugo, Spain
Ordained Bishopde la Trinidad, Monastery, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Death PlacePuebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,814
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 72, Number 425
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: AT, 3 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 3 May 2025