Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco del Toral, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1561AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
24 May 1562Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
15 Aug 1562InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
20 Apr 1571DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Francisco del Toral:
Bishop Francisco del Toral O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,815
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013