Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Torcella

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1532AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
27 Apr 1533Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
6 Apr 1541AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
1572¹DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Torcella:
Bishop Miguel Torcella , Bishop of Anagni

  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 104, and Page 107
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 44, Number 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013