Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Manuel

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1523AppointedBishop of León, Spain
17 Jun 1534AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
9 Apr 1546AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
1 Jan 1550DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manuel:
Archbishop Pedro Manuel (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 36, Number 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 173, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013