Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Santos García de Ontiveros y Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535¹Born
22 May 159257.3AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
3 Oct 159358.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
6 Nov 159358.8InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Jun 159661.4DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Santos García de Ontiveros y Martínez (VIAF: 87698472)
Bishop Francisco Santos García de Ontiveros y Martínez (born 1535, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrigal, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,560
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,828
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 106, Number 670
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1593, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018