Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Martinez Aguirre, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarahumara, Chihuahua

Titular Bishop of Arca in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1897BornArandas
28 Jul 192931.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Jul 195860.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
4 Jul 195860.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
9 Sep 195860.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
25 May 197375.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México
3 Dec 198790.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarahumara, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Salvador Martinez Aguirre:
Bishop Salvador Martinez Aguirre S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarahumara

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013