Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo de Alzola, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
1 Oct 158250.7AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Oct 158250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Feb 159058.1DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo de Alzola
Bishop Domingo de Alzola O.P. (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondragón, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAtoyac

  • a bishop for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,559
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,631
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 95, Number 591
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018