Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de la Mota y Escobar

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1546³Born
31 Mar 159447.8AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
159548.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Nicaragua
11 Mar 159851.8AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
Jun 1599³53.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
12 Feb 160760.7AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
16 Mar 162578.8DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de la Mota y Escobar (VIAF: 10006016)
Bishop Alfonso de la Mota y Escobar (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico
Ordained BishopPuebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Death PlacePuebla, Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 25.7 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 198, and Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018