Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Alcalde y Barriga, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1701BornCigales, Spain
25 Jan 176260.8AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
8 May 176362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
1 Aug 176362.3InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
6 Dec 177170.7SelectedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Jan 177270.8ConfirmedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
7 Aug 179291.3DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio Alcalde y Barriga:
Bishop Antonio Alcalde y Barriga O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 80, Number 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230, and Page 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015