Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Navarro Acevedo

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1727BornCartagena
13 Mar 177547.9AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
Jul 1776³49.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
19 Sep 178861.4DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Navarro Acevedo:
Bishop Francisco Navarro Acevedo (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015