Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Camacho y Ávila

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1652BornBadajoz, Spain
28 Nov 169543.0AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
19 Aug 169643.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
14 Jan 170451.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
24 May 170754.5InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 Oct 171259.9DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Diego Camacho y Ávila:
Archbishop Diego Camacho y Ávila (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 238, Number 1,477
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213, and Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015