Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Aranda y Carpinteiro

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1776BornPuebla
180023.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183659.6AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
30 Nov 183659.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
4 Dec 183660.0InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
17 Mar 185376.2DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Diego de Aranda y Carpinteiro:
Bishop Diego de Aranda y Carpinteiro (born , died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013