Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Domingo Sánchez Reza

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Macri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1779BornMonte Escobedo
15 Sep 180526.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 180526.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 184363.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
24 Sep 184364.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
30 Mar 1882102.6DiedTitular Bishop of Macri

MicroData Summary for José Domingo Sánchez Reza
Bishop José Domingo Sánchez Reza (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Macri

  • a priest for 76.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 249
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016