Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Felipe Gallardo Martín del Campo, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1941 Born
22 Dec 196726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Dec 200059.0AppointedPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
24 Feb 200159.1Ordained BishopPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
8 May 200664.4AppointedBishop of Veracruz, México
12 Nov 201876.9RetiredBishop of Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Felipe Gallardo Martín del Campo
Bishop Luis Felipe Gallardo Martín del Campo S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Veracruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrapuato
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ayutla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Veracruz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,918
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast