Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Braulio Sánchez Fuentes, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Mixes, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1922BornMéxico
28 Oct 195028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Jan 197047.4AppointedPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
14 Jan 197047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
1 May 197047.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
15 Feb 197855.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
16 Dec 200078.4RetiredPrelate of Mixes, Oaxaca, México
18 Nov 200381.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Mixes, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Braulio Sánchez Fuentes:
Bishop Braulio Sánchez Fuentes S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Mixes

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013