Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Roberto Domínguez Couttolenc, M.G.

Bishop of Ecatepec, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1956 BornPuebla
11 Jun 198327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros de Guadalupe
27 Mar 200750.9AppointedBishop of Tlapa, Guerrero, México
11 Jun 200751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tlapa, Guerrero, México
17 Jul 201256.2AppointedBishop of Ecatepec, México, México
17 Sep 201256.3InstalledBishop of Ecatepec, México, México

MicroData Summary for Oscar Roberto Domínguez Couttolenc:
Bishop Oscar Roberto Domínguez Couttolenc M.G. (born ) Bishop of Ecatepec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ecatepec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,433
  • i: CB, 19 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013