Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Benitez y Cabañas, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

Titular Bishop of Isba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1863Born
27 Jul 189632.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Dec 192663.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
23 Dec 192663.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Isba
30 Oct 192764.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isba
3 Jul 193369.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Benitez y Cabañas
Bishop Luis Benitez y Cabañas S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tulancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuebla de los Angeles

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,927, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast