Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Ormaechea y Ernáiz

Deceased

Bishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1812Born
183623.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 186350.8AppointedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
1 May 186451.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
16 Dec 186452.5InstalledBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México
19 Mar 188471.8DiedBishop of Tulancingo, Hidalgo, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Ormaechea y Ernáiz (VIAF: 41620373)
Bishop Juan Bautista Ormaechea y Ernáiz (born , died ) Bishop of Tulancingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopSacristy of the, Cathedral, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceTulancingo, Diocese of Tulancingo, Hidalgo

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 572
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017