Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nicanor Corona e Izarraraz

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1825Born
25 Dec 184823.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187348.9AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
26 Apr 187449.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
23 May 187449.3InstalledBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
27 Jul 188358.5DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for José Nicanor Corona e Izarraraz
Bishop José Nicanor Corona e Izarraraz (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Santiago, Archdiocese of Michoacán
Ordained BishopMorelia, Archdiocese of Michoacán

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 353
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,874, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast