Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Ranzahuer González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1928Born
22 Dec 195123.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 196940.9AppointedBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
22 Mar 196941.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
12 Jun 200476.2RetiredBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
5 Aug 200880.3DiedBishop Emeritus of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Ranzahuer González
Bishop Guillermo Ranzahuer González (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Andrés Tuxtla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuatusco
Ordained BishopSan Andrés Tuxtla, Diocese of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast