Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio José de Omaña y Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1739³BornSantiago Tianguistengo
24 Sep 179253.5AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
24 Feb 179353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
11 Oct 179758.5DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio José de Omaña y Sotomayor
Bishop Gregorio José de Omaña y Sotomayor (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,915
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016