Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Fabián y Fuero

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1719Born
4 Feb 176545.4AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
14 Jul 176545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
13 Sep 177354.0AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
14 Nov 177354.2InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
28 May 179575.8RetiredArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
3 Aug 180181.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Fabián y Fuero (VIAF: 20575972)
Archbishop Francisco Fabián y Fuero (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarzaga

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 82, Number 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409, and Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018