Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Cortez y Larraz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1712BornBelchite, Spain
2 Jun 176653.9AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
23 Aug 176755.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
13 Dec 177967.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tortosa, Spain
23 Jul 178674.1RetiredBishop of Tortosa, Spain
7 Jul 178775.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Cortez y Larraz:
Archbishop Pedro Cortez y Larraz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 195, and Page 231
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 85, Number 429
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1767, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015