Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José de Palencia

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1709Born
15 Mar 177363.2AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
17 Oct 177363.8Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
Nov 1775³65.8DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José de Palencia
Bishop Francisco José de Palencia (born , died Nov 1775) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanarias, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,654
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 91, Number 464
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,773, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast