Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jose Epigmenio Villanueva y Gomez de Eguiarreta

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1792Born
11 Mar 181522.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Apr 181523.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183947.7AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
13 May 184048.1DiedBishop-Elect of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary for Jose Epigmenio Villanueva y Gomez de Eguiarreta
Father Jose Epigmenio Villanueva y Gomez de Eguiarreta (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaxco

  • a priest for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 78
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018