Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gregorio Alonso de Ortigosa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1720³Born
29 May 177555.0AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
17 Dec 177555.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
21 Sep 179272.3ResignedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
27 Aug 179777.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Gregorio Alonso de Ortigosa
Bishop José Gregorio Alonso de Ortigosa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViguera, Logroño, Spain

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 92, Number 473
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast