Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victoriano López Gonzalo

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1735Born
13 Sep 177338.4AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
6 Mar 177438.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
24 Jul 178651.3AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
14 Dec 178954.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
21 Nov 180570.6DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Victoriano López Gonzalo
Bishop Victoriano López Gonzalo (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerzana

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 466
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018