Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cayetano Franco y Monroy

Deceased

Archbishop of Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1736Born
1 Jun 177841.8AppointedArchbishop of Guatemala
24 Aug 177943.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Guatemala
17 Jul 179255.9DiedArchbishop of Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Franco y Monroy
Archbishop Cayetano Franco y Monroy (born , died ) Archbishop of Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillavicencio de los Caballeros, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 95, Number 492
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,779, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast