Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Ortiz del Puerto y Colmenares Salgado

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
3 Oct 167858.7AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
14 Jan 168060.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
13 Aug 168161.6DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Ortiz del Puerto y Colmenares Salgado
Bishop Nicolás Ortiz del Puerto y Colmenares Salgado (born 1620, died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Catalina Minas

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 87
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018