Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bartolome de Bohórquez e Hinojosa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1542Born
17 Jul 161168.8AppointedBishop of Coro, Venezuela
13 Nov 161775.2AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
Sep 1633³91.0DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bartolome de Bohórquez e Hinojosa
Bishop Juan Bartolome de Bohórquez e Hinojosa O.P. (born , died Sep 1633) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018