Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé de Benavente y Benavides

Deceased

Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1594Born
27 Jun 163944.8AppointedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
1640²45.3Ordained BishopBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
26 Jul 165257.9DiedBishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé de Benavente y Benavides
Bishop Bartolomé de Benavente y Benavides (born , died ) Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 169, Number 1,058
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Aug 2020

Quantcast