Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé González Soltero

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornMéxico
1 Jul 164161.5AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
5 Jul 164363.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
25 Feb 165070.1DiedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé González Soltero:
Bishop Bartolomé González Soltero (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015